IN SB0385 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Assessment of business personal property taxes. Provides that the business personal property exemption from taxation is based on the assessed value instead of the acquisition cost.
Title
Assessment of business personal property taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Chris Garten [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] |
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. John Crane [R] | Rep. Heath VanNatter [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senators Kruse and Crane added as coauthors |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative VanNatter |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 177: yeas 40, nays 9 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Taylor G) failed; voice vote |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Garten added as second author |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Zay added as coauthor |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Freeman |