IN SB0378 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 155: Yeas 12 and Nays 38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires state educational institutions to disclose gifts received from foreign governments, foreign legal entities, and foreign persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disclosure of gifts from foreign entity.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-02 Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 155: Yeas 12 and Nays 38
2010-02-01 Senator Steele added as coauthor
2010-02-01 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-02-01 Senator Kruse added as second author
2010-02-01 Senator Kruse removed as coauthor
2010-02-01 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-28 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-21 Senators Stutzman and Head added as coauthors
2010-01-14 Senators Kruse, Delph and Yoder added as coauthors
2010-01-12 First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2010-01-12 Authored by Senator Walker

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback