IN SB0374 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regional water or sewer district service areas. Provides that the services in those parts of a regional water, sewage, or solid waste district (district) in which they are provided or made available by the district shall not be curtailed or limited by: (1) the inclusion of all or part of the district's territory, by annexation or otherwise, within the boundaries of: (A) any municipality; or (B) the service territory of another provider of the same services; or (2) the granting of any private franchise to provide the same services within all or part of the district's territory; during the term of any loan under which the district is obligated, regardless of whether the loan is made by a public or private lender. Provides that the occurrence of any of these events does not require a district to secure any franchise, license, or permit as a condition to continuing to provide service to any part of the district's territory served by the district at the time of the occurrence of the event.
Title
Regional water or sewer district service areas.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Shane Lindauer [R] |
Rep. Steve Bartels [R] | Rep. Jim Pressel [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Public Law 27 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2022-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 213: yeas 93, nays 1 |
2022-02-17 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-15 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Bartels and Pressel |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lindauer |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 128: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Messmer |