IN SB0371 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 136
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Abortion inducing drugs and abortion clinics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion inducing drugs and abortion clinics.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House - Amendment 6 (Errington), failed (Y: 26 N: 66 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - House - Amendment 5 (Errington), failed (Y: 30 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 379 (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 376 (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 136
2013-05-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-17HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-16SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-11SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 458: yeas 35, nays 14
2013-04-10SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-04-08SenateSenator M. Young added as second author
2013-04-02HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-04-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 389: yeas 70, nays 26
2013-04-01HouseAmendment 1 (VanDenburgh), ruled out of order
2013-04-01HouseRuling of the Chair appealed. Ruling sustained; Roll Call 379: yeas 61, nays 30
2013-04-01HouseAmendment 8 (Austin), ruled out of order
2013-04-01HouseAmendment 7 (Lawson), failed; voice vote
2013-04-01HouseAmendment 6 (Errington), failed; Roll Call 378: yeas 26, nays 66
2013-04-01HouseAmendment 5 (Errington), failed; Roll Call 377: yeas 30, nays 61
2013-04-01HouseRuling of the Chair appealed. Ruling sustained; Roll Call 376: yeas 61, nays 30
2013-04-01HouseAmendment 12 (Pelath), ruled out of order
2013-04-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2013-02-26SenateCosponsors: Reps. Lehman and Morris
2013-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Negele
2013-02-26SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 224: yeas 33 and nays 16
2013-02-25SenateAmendment 2 (Taylor), rejected; voice vote
2013-02-25SenateAmendment 3 (Lanane), rejected; voice vote
2013-02-25SenateAmendment 1 (Alting), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-25SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-02-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2013-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Holdman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2013&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0371
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/IN/IN0371.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SB/SB0371.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SB/SB0371.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/ES/ES0371.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SE/SE0371.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0224.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0376.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0377.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0378.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0379.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0389.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0458.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback