IN SB0371 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Concurrence withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Renames "emergency medical technician-intermediate" as "advanced emergency medical technician". Deletes the term "emergency medical technician- basic advanced". Renames "first responders" as "emergency medical responders". Authorizes the Indiana emergency medical services commission (commission) to implement an emergency services personnel certification program through emergency rules. Requires that an emergency medical dispatcher must have completed training that meets specified standards and removes language in which the commission certified an emergency medical dispatch agency. Allows an individual who is currently certified as (1) an emergency medical technician-basic advanced, or (2) an emergency medical technician-intermediate two years to comply with new certification requirements for emergency medical services personnel. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency medical services matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-06 Concurrence withdrawn
2012-02-28 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2012-02-27 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2012-02-27 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 249: yeas 85, nays 11
2012-02-23 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-02-21 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-02-13 Representative Grubb added as cosponsor
2012-02-13 First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2012-02-01 House sponsor: Rep. R. Frye
2012-02-01 Referred to the House
2012-02-01 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 178: yeas 49 and nays 0
2012-01-30 Senator Wyss added as coauthor
2012-01-30 Senator Arnold added as second author
2012-01-30 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-01-24 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-01-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs
2012-01-09 Authored by Senator Mishler

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback