IN SB0366 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 189
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Solid waste management districts. Provides that the requirement for each county to have a single-county solid waste management district or be a member of a joint solid waste management district expires July 1, 2017. Provides that after June 30, 2017: (1) a county may dissolve its single county solid waste management district if: (A) the county executive and county fiscal body adopt ordinances in favor of the dissolution of the district; and (B) the county legislative body follows the procedure by which a political subdivision that established another political subdivision may dissolve that other political subdivision; or (2) a county,

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid waste management districts. Provides that the requirement for each county to have a single-county solid waste management district or be a member of a joint solid waste management district expires July 1, 2017. Provides that after June 30, 2017: (1) a county may dissolve its single county solid waste management district if: (A) the county executive and county fiscal body adopt ordinances in favor of the dissolution of the district; and (B) the county legislative body follows the procedure by which a political subdivision that established another political subdivision may dissolve that other political subdivision; or (2) a county,

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24SenatePublic Law 189
2016-03-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-03-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-10SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-09HouseJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2016-03-09SenateJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
2016-03-07SenateSenate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 350: yeas 34, nays 16
2016-03-04SenateMotion to concur filed
2016-03-01HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2016-03-01HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 310: yeas 83, nays 12
2016-02-29HouseAmendment #1 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-29HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-02-25HouseRepresentative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor
2016-02-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-09HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2016-02-02SenateReferred to the House
2016-02-01SenateCosponsor: Representative Slager
2016-02-01SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Lehman
2016-02-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 115: yeas 37, nays 13
2016-01-28SenateAmendment #2 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote
2016-01-28SenateAmendment #5 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote
2016-01-28SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-01-26SenateSenator Niemeyer added as second author
2016-01-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2016-01-11SenateAuthored by Senator Brown L

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/senate/366/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/6/9/7e69dd0a/SB0366.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/0/4/8c046de2/SB0366.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/4/7/a4471a58/SB0366.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/a/2/27a201b5/SB0366.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/6/2/ea6289d2/SB0366.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/7/f/c47f8ab2/SB0366.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/9/c/fa9c4564/SB0366.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/2/1/74214240/SB0366.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/5/6/72569ee0/SB0366.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/7/c/497c899b/SB0366.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/d/d/10dd772d/SB0366.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/6/8/2b6894e5/SB0366.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/1/9/a11979db/SB0366.115.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/6/b/396b829f/SB0366.03.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/7/2/1772e435/SB0366.310.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/6/3/6c638dd5/SB0366.350.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback