IN SB0356 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education matters. Makes changes to the requirements necessary to obtain an initial practitioner license for an individual who completes an alternative teacher certification program and changes regarding teaching special education under the license. Provides that, for school years beginning after June 30, 2022, a school corporation may provide a supplemental payment to a teacher in excess of the salary specified in the school corporation's compensation plan. (Current law allows a school corporation to provide supplemental payment to a teacher in excess of the salary specified in the school corporation's compensation plan if certain circumstances apply.)
Title
Education matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 25 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 25 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Public Law 134 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-08 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 376: yeas 64, nays 30 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 358: yeas 39, nays 11 |
2022-03-08 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as conferee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senator Qaddoura removed as conferee |
2022-03-02 | House | House advisors appointed: Goodrich, Clere and Smith V |
2022-03-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Behning and DeLaney |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Buchanan and Yoder |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Rogers and Qaddoura |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-03-01 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 301: yeas 64, nays 32 |
2022-02-23 | House | Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 265: yeas 25, nays 63 |
2022-02-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Goodrich and Teshka J |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Behning |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 180: yeas 31, nays 18 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Amendment #11 (Rogers) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senators Zay and Walker G added as coauthors |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senators Perfect, Sandlin, Holdman added as coauthors |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as coauthor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senators Donato, Bassler, Boots, Kruse added as coauthors |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senators Brown L and Gaskill added as coauthors |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Buchanan added as second author |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as third author |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rogers |