IN SB0340 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Became law without the Governors signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that industrial customers of an electricity supplier may opt out of participating in an energy efficiency program implemented by the electricity supplier in response to an order of the utility regulatory commission (commission) concerning demand side management (DSM) programs. Provides that the commission may adopt rules or guidelines to assist electricity suppliers and industrial customers. Provides that certain energy efficiency programs may not be renewed after December 31, 2014. Provides that, after December 31, 2014, an electricity supplier may offer an energy efficiency program and, if authorized by the IURC, recover associated costs. Requires the commission to provide a status report on energy efficiency programs implemented under DSM orders, including the effects on customer rates and charges, to the regulatory flexibility committee and the legislative council by August 15, 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Demand side management programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee on Utilities and Energy - Roll Call 034003 (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 11 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Utilities - Roll Call 034001 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-28SenateBecame law without the Governors signature
2014-03-24SenatePublic Law 223
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-13SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-10SenateMotion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 379: yeas 37 and nays 8
2014-02-26HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2014-02-26HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 295: yeas 69 and nays 26
2014-02-25HouseSB 340 Amendment #10 (VanNatter), prevailed.
2014-02-25HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-02-20HouseRepresentative Hamm added as cosponsor.
2014-02-20HouseRepresentative VanNatter added as cosponsor.
2014-02-13HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-10HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Utilities and Energy
2014-02-03SenateRepresentative Koch added sponsor.
2014-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2014-02-03SenateSenator Leising added as third author.
2014-02-03SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 116: yeas 37 and nays 11
2014-01-30SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-01-30SenateSB 340 Amendment #1 (Stoops) motion withdrawn.
2014-01-30SenateSB 340 Amendment #2 (Breaux), failed.
2014-01-30SenateSB 340 Amendment #5 (Broden), failed.
2014-01-30SenateSB 340 Amendment #7 (Breaux), failed.
2014-01-30SenateSB 340 Amendment #6 (Merritt), prevailed.
2014-01-27SenateSenator Kruse added as second author.
2014-01-24SenateCommittee report: do pass amend, adopted.
2014-01-14SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Utilities
2014-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Merritt.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/340/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/5/8/995801de/SB0340.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/a/b/beab90f6/SB0340.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/a/1/f0a1f89e/SB0340.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/7/d/217d87e3/SB0340.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/8/3/2783e05a/SB0340.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/7/3/b273a9ed/SB0340.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/0/a/400a9c02/SB0340.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/1/c/781cb011/SB0340.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/0/a/210aad29/SB0340.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/f/1/6df13ccb/SB0340.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/c/2/a4c2943f/SB0340.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/4/d/b64deefd/SB0340.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/1/4/8e14de93/SB0340.02.COMS.82.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/9/6/8c969dff/SB0340.03.ENGS.116.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/5/1/d3517ff9/SB0340.03.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/1/b/881be3ae/SB0340.04.COMH.269.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/5/9/2f594bcc/SB0340.04.COMH.295.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/0/a/b80ad36f/SB0340.05.ENGH.295.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/8/a/278ac177/SB0340.05.ENGH.379.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback