IN SB0336 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Misdemeanor penalties. Makes numerous misdemeanors civil infractions for the first offense. Repeals the crimes of vending machine vandalism and refusing to yield a party line. Increases the penalty for obstructing a medical person from a Class B misdemeanor to a Class A misdemeanor. Makes conforming provisions and repeals obsolete provisions.
Title
Misdemeanor penalties. Makes numerous misdemeanors civil infractions for the first offense. Repeals the crimes of vending machine vandalism and refusing to yield a party line. Increases the penalty for obstructing a medical person from a Class B misdemeanor to a Class A misdemeanor. Makes conforming provisions and repeals obsolete provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. John Young [R] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public Law 32 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 383: yeas 46, nays 2 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2019-03-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 362: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2019-03-26 | House | Amendment #1 (Bartels) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-03-26 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative DeLaney |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Young J |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 228: yeas 45, nays 4 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Glick) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senator Glick added as third author |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as second author |
2019-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young M |