IN SB0331 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the division of aging, the bureau of aging services, the division of disability and rehabilitative services, and the bureau of developmental disabilities services to issue certain notice orders and citations against a provider that violates certain rules. Allows the Indiana state police to release criminal background check information concerning the maintenance of a provider's license. Requires the division of aging to establish standards of practice governing the services provided by the adult protective services unit. Requires the Alzheimer's disease and related senile dementia task force (task force) to develop a state plan concerning the provision of Alzheimer's and related senile dementia services and sunsets the task force on December 31, 2013. Reduces the statewide independent living council from a minimum of 20 members to a minimum of 11 members. Requires a family to be provided a cash assistance benefit of at least $10 under the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program if certain income standards and employment earnings are met. Specifies that access to a child support enforcement program and IMPACT (JOBS) training program are included as TANF services for certain eligible families. Deems that a Medicaid recipient has automatically assigned certain medical support rights for the duration of the recipient's enrollment in Medicaid. Changes the time after which certain Medicaid program changes may take effect from 45 to 30 days after issuance of the notice or bulletin concerning the change. Provides that the notice or bulletin is void if it is not properly communicated to the parties. Removes language from the definition of "Medicaid inpatient days" concerning dually eligible individuals. Transfers administrative rules concerning aging to the division of aging. Requires the probate study commission to study how to amend probate law concerning the sale of real estate to satisfy certain claims. Repeals: (1) a provision that requires the adult protective services unit and the division of aging to destroy any records concerning a report concerning an endangered adult that is unsubstantiated; (2) expiration dates for the office of the secretary of family and social services, the office of Medicaid policy and planning, the statutes concerning directors of divisions within family and social services (FSSA), and certain advisory committees under the FSSA statutes; (3) the law concerning Alzheimer's disease and related senile dementia programs; and (4) the law concerning supplemental payments for ambulance transportation services. Makes technical changes.
Title
FSSA matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Amendment 1 (C. Brown), prevailed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Amendment 1 (C. Brown), prevailed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Public Law 153 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 515: yeas 49, nays 0 | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 723: yeas 98, nays 0 | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2011-04-21 | House advisors appointed: Davisson, Crouch and Riecken | |
2011-04-21 | House conferees appointed: T. Brown and C. Brown | |
2011-04-20 | Senate advisors appointed: Gard, Rogers and Grooms | |
2011-04-20 | Senate conferees appointed: Miller and Breaux | |
2011-04-20 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 565: yeas 94, nays 0 | |
2011-04-18 | Amendment 1 (C. Brown), prevailed; Roll Call 554: yeas 94, nays 0 | |
2011-04-18 | Amendment 2 (T. Brown), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-04-18 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-02-22 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | |
2011-02-22 | Cosponsor: Rep. C. Brown | |
2011-02-22 | House sponsor: Rep. T. Brown | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-22 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 231: yeas 49 and nays 0 | |
2011-02-21 | Senator Simpson added as third author | |
2011-02-21 | Senator Gard added as second author | |
2011-02-21 | Amendment 1 (Miller), prevailed; | |
2011-02-21 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2011-01-11 | Authored by Senator Miller |