IN SB0329 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 113
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 113
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disposition of aborted remains. Defines "fetus". Establishes a right, beginning January 1, 2016, for a pregnant woman who has an abortion to determine the final disposition of the aborted fetus. Requires that a pregnant woman be informed orally and in writing before an abortion: (1) that the pregnant woman has a right to determine the final disposition of the remains of the aborted fetus; (2) of available options for disposition of the aborted fetus; and (3) of available counseling services. Requires the state department of health to: (1) adopt rules concerning the disposal methods to be used for aborted fetuses;
Title
Disposition of aborted remains. Defines "fetus". Establishes a right, beginning January 1, 2016, for a pregnant woman who has an abortion to determine the final disposition of the aborted fetus. Requires that a pregnant woman be informed orally and in writing before an abortion: (1) that the pregnant woman has a right to determine the final disposition of the remains of the aborted fetus; (2) of available options for disposition of the aborted fetus; and (3) of available counseling services. Requires the state department of health to: (1) adopt rules concerning the disposal methods to be used for aborted fetuses;
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Provider Services - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Provider Services - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Public Law 113 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 488: yeas 41, nays 6 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-16 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2015-04-15 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 450: yeas 80, nays 17 |
2015-04-14 | House | Amendment #1 (Torr) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-14 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representatives Bacon, Morris, Carbaugh, Zent added as cosponsors |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as third author |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative Judy added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 238: yeas 43, nays 7 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Young, M. added as coauthor |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Brown L) prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 37, nays 10 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Senator Banks A added as second author |
2015-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Health & Provider Services |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown L |