IN SB0329 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Public Law 163
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires attic spaces and basements or crawl spaces to be inspected during a home inspection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home inspections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development - Roll Call 032902 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 032901 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26SenatePublic Law 163
2014-03-26SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-14SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-14HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-12SenateConference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 387: yeas 45 and nays 2
2014-03-10HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 435: yeas 75 and nays 0
2014-03-04HouseRepresentative Hale added as advisor
2014-03-04HouseRepresentative VanNatter added as advisor
2014-03-04HouseRepresentative Pryor added as conferee
2014-03-04HouseRepresentative Niemeyer added as conferee
2014-02-27SenateSenator Randolph added as advisor
2014-02-27SenateSenator Bray added as advisor
2014-02-27SenateSenator Rogers added as conferee
2014-02-27SenateSenator Head added as conferee
2014-02-27SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2014-02-18HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2014-02-18HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 232: yeas 97 and nays 0
2014-02-17HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-02-17HouseSB 329 Amendment #1 (Dermody), prevailed.
2014-02-13HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-10HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
2014-02-04SenateRepresentative Pryor added as cosponsor.
2014-02-04SenateRepresentative Niemeyer added sponsor.
2014-02-04SenateReferred to the House
2014-02-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 181: yeas 48 and nays 0
2014-02-03SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor.
2014-02-03SenateSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-01-23SenateSenator Head added as second author.
2014-01-23SenateSenator Rogers added as first author.
2014-01-23SenateSenator Arnold removed as first author.
2014-01-23SenateSenator Rogers removed as second author.
2014-01-14SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Local Government
2014-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Arnold, Rogers.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/329/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/e/7/f4e780b5/SB0329.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/2/d/9a2d5931/SB0329.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/3/2/d132c3f1/SB0329.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/2/6/e02603a1/SB0329.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/6/2/9a6260a2/SB0329.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/9/8/4898e053/SB0329.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/8/4/c784135d/SB0329.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/a/7/36a7cc73/SB0329.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/5/f/825fbe44/SB0329.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/c/f/49cf7669/SB0329.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/3/b/393b119e/SB0329.02.COMS.181.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/8/a/2c8aef6e/SB0329.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/2/9/df295354/SB0329.04.ENGH.232.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/d/2/05d267ba/SB0329.04.ENGH.435.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/9/6/459612d8/SB0329.04.ENGH.387.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback