IN SB0326 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Senator Kruse added as second author
Pending: Senate Health and Provider Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Integrated school based mental health. Establishes the integrated school based mental health and substance use disorder services grant program (program) to provide grants to school corporations for the development, implementation, and maintenance of integrated school based mental health and substance use disorder services plans. Requires the department of education, in coordination with the division of mental health and addiction, to administer the program. Provides that, beginning after June 30, 2020, a school corporation is eligible for a grant if the school corporation meets the requirements of the program. Establishes the requirements to participate in the program and grant amounts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Integrated school based mental health. Establishes the integrated school based mental health and substance use disorder services grant program (program) to provide grants to school corporations for the development, implementation, and maintenance of integrated school based mental health and substance use disorder services plans. Requires the department of education, in coordination with the division of mental health and addiction, to administer the program. Provides that, beginning after June 30, 2020, a school corporation is eligible for a grant if the school corporation meets the requirements of the program. Establishes the requirements to participate in the program and grant amounts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateSenator Kruse added as second author
2019-01-14SenateSenator Becker added as coauthor
2019-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Crider

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback