IN SB0324 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Public Law 18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Public Law 18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disabled veterans parking placards. Requires the bureau of motor vehicles to design a parking placard that designates that the placard has been issued to a person who has been issued or is otherwise eligible to receive a disabled Hoosier veteran plate. Provides that the placard does not have an expiration date. Provides that a person who is qualified to receive a disabled Hoosier veteran plate and has been issued a permanent parking placard may not be charged a fee for parking in a metered space or assessed a penalty for parking in a metered space for longer than the time permitted.
Title
Disabled veterans parking placards. Requires the bureau of motor vehicles to design a parking placard that designates that the placard has been issued to a person who has been issued or is otherwise eligible to receive a disabled Hoosier veteran plate. Provides that the placard does not have an expiration date. Provides that a person who is qualified to receive a disabled Hoosier veteran plate and has been issued a permanent parking placard may not be charged a fee for parking in a metered space or assessed a penalty for parking in a metered space for longer than the time permitted.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Chris Garten [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. John Crane [R] |
Rep. Christopher Judy [R] | Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. John Bartlett [D] | Rep. Jim Pressel [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Public Law 18 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 346: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2019-03-25 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2019-03-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 333: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2019-03-19 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | Representatives Zent, Bartlett, Pressel added as cosponsors |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Judy |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 32: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senator Glick added as third author |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senator Garten added as second author |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crider |