IN SB0320 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Withholding tax remittance. Provides that the department of state revenue (department) shall only accept payment of employer withholding taxes that are made or withdrawn directly from the business account of the employer that is liable for withholding and remitting the tax. However, provides an exception from the requirement for employers that submit a waiver to the department. Specifies provisions for the waiver. Prohibits the department from accepting payment of employer withholding taxes that are made or withdrawn from the account of a third party withholding agent, or otherwise remitted by a third party withholding agent, on behalf of an employer, except in the case of an employer that has submitted a waiver. Defines "third party withholding agent". Requires each employer that is required to remit withholding taxes to provide to the department an authorization for reoccurring payment of taxes from the employer's business account that is designated by the employer on the department's online INtax system (INtax). Requires the department to automatically withdraw from the employer's business account the amount of tax withholdings that are reported as due and owing on the taxpayer's Form WH-1 report. Requires the department to provide periodic notice to each employer through INtax of: (1) the date on which the employer's Form WH-1 report is received by the department; and (2) the date on which the department has automatically withdrawn any amount of tax from the employer's business account. However, provides an exception from these requirements for employers that submit a waiver to the department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Withholding tax remittance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2020-02-04SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2020-02-04SenateCosponsors: Representatives Morris and Cherry
2020-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Miller D
2020-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 163: yeas 48, nays 1
2020-02-03SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2020-02-03SenateSenator Sandlin added as coauthor
2020-02-03SenateSenators Perfect and Raatz added as coauthors
2020-02-03SenateAmendment #1 (Rogers) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-28SenateSenator Gaskill added as coauthor
2020-01-27SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2020-01-27SenateSenators Tomes and Doriot added as coauthors
2020-01-23SenateSenators Bohacek and Ford J.D. added as coauthors
2020-01-21SenateSenators Buck, Charbonneau, Niezgodski added as coauthors
2020-01-14SenateSenator Buchanan added as third author
2020-01-14SenateSenator Holdman added as second author
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2020-01-13SenateAuthored by Senator Rogers

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback