IN SB0315 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Senator Ford J.D. added as third author
Pending: Senate Education and Career Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Senator Ford J.D. added as third author
Pending: Senate Education and Career Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Education study committee. Provides that, before May 1, 2022, the department of education shall establish a committee for the purpose of quantifying: (1) appropriate class sizes; (2) maximum caseloads for speech-language pathologists; (3) maximum caseloads for school social workers; (4) appropriate guidance counselor to student ratios; and (5) the number of unfilled position vacancies that exist in Indiana for each position. Requires issuance of a final report to the secretary of education, governor, and legislative council not later than November 1, 2022.
Title
Education study committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as third author |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senators Becker and Alting |