IN SB0307 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Marion County sheriff's commissary fund. Requires any purchases and contracts by the Marion County sheriff that are payable from the jail commissary fund (fund) to be made in accordance with local purchasing laws and regulations. Requires the Marion County sheriff or sheriff's designee to appear at least quarterly at a meeting of the county fiscal body to present a report regarding purchases or contracts that are payable from the fund.
Title
Marion County sheriff's commissary fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Young J |
2022-01-27 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 93: yeas 35, nays 11 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Sandlin) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senators Sandlin and Young M |