IN SB0292 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal law matters. Repeals the offense of auto theft and receiving stolen auto parts. Provides that a person who knowingly or intentionally exerts unauthorized control of a motor vehicle or a component part of a motor vehicle, with the intent to deprive the other person of any part of its value or use, commits theft, a Level 6 felony. Provides that a person who knowingly or intentionally exerts unauthorized control of a motor vehicle or a component part of a motor vehicle, with the intent to deprive the other person of any part of its value or use, and has
Title
Criminal law matters. Repeals the offense of auto theft and receiving stolen auto parts. Provides that a person who knowingly or intentionally exerts unauthorized control of a motor vehicle or a component part of a motor vehicle, with the intent to deprive the other person of any part of its value or use, commits theft, a Level 6 felony. Provides that a person who knowingly or intentionally exerts unauthorized control of a motor vehicle or a component part of a motor vehicle, with the intent to deprive the other person of any part of its value or use, and has
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-05 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Burton |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 138: yeas 41, nays 7 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young M |