IN SB0292 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-26 - Senator Breaux added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-26 - Senator Breaux added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a county hospital to own, operate, or contract with a person to operate a health facility. Specifies the quality assessment fee rate to be paid by certain county hospitals, including health and hospital corporation, that are operate a health facility.
Title
County hospitals operating health facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-26 | Senator Breaux added as coauthor | |
2010-01-21 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-12 | Senator Buck added as second author | |
2010-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2010-01-11 | Authored by Senator Waterman |