IN SB0283 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study of public notice publication. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on government the topic of the publication of public notices in print publications and digital publications.
Title
Interim study of public notice publication.
Sponsors
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Rodney Pol [D] |
Rep. Doug Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Pol added as coauthor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Miller D |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 168: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as third author |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Niemeyer added as second author |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Buck |