IN SB0283 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of education to waive accreditation standards for an accredited nonpublic alternative high school that contracts with a school corporation to provide alternative education services for students who: (1) have dropped out of high school; (2) have been expelled; or (3) were not successful in the school corporation; to accommodate the nonpublic alternative high school's program and student population. Provides that a school corporation that enrolls a student who has legal settlement in another school corporation for the student to receive services from a nonpublic alternative high school receives state tuition support for the student. Provides that a student who is placed in a residential facility is entitled to receive certain defined educational services from the school corporation in which the facility is located.
Title
Nonpublic alternative high schools; residential facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-01 | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 307: yeas 43, nays 4 | |
2012-02-27 | Motion to concur in House amendments filed | |
2012-02-21 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2012-02-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 218: yeas 66, nays 27 | |
2012-02-20 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-16 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-02-01 | Cosponsors: Reps. Behning, Rhoads and Sullivan | |
2012-02-01 | House sponsor: Rep. Thompson | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to the House | |
2012-02-01 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 170: yeas 48 and nays 2 | |
2012-01-31 | Amendment 1 (Yoder), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-31 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-31 | Senator Holdman added as second author | |
2012-01-30 | Senator Skinner added as coauthor | |
2012-01-26 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Kruse |