IN SB0279 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Post-exposure prophylaxis reimbursement. Changes the definition of "additional forensic services" to include HIV prophylactic medication, and removes discretionary reimbursement for the service.
Title
Post-exposure prophylaxis reimbursement. Changes the definition of "additional forensic services" to include HIV prophylactic medication, and removes discretionary reimbursement for the service.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] | Rep. Charlie Brown [D] | Rep. Sue Errington [D] | Rep. Dennis Zent [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Public Law 104 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 412: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-04-05 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-03-23 | House | Representative Zent added as cosponsor |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Brown, C. and Errington |
2017-02-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 223: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senator Crider added as coauthor |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Lanane |