IN SB0277 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Travel insurance. Adds and amends definitions regarding travel insurance. Permits the commissioner of the department of insurance to issue a limited lines travel insurance producer license to a travel retailer if certain conditions are met. Establishes requirements for offering and disseminating information regarding travel insurance policies.
Title
Travel insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Kyle Walker [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Jeff Ellington [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Public Law 19 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-15 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2022-02-14 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 177: yeas 93, nays 2 |
2022-02-10 | House | Representative Ellington added as cosponsor |
2022-02-10 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as coauthor |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Walker K added as coauthor |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as second author |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Lehman |
2022-01-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 76: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Zay |