IN SB0273 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - Senator Walker added as second author
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - Senator Walker added as second author
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
State civil service system; employee organizations.
Title
State civil service system; employee organizations.
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. David Long [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 2 (Simpson), failed (Y: 14 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 4 (Tallian), failed (Y: 7 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 3 (Simpson), failed (Y: 7 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 4 (Tallian), failed (Y: 7 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 3 (Simpson), failed (Y: 7 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | Senator Walker added as second author | |
2011-02-21 | Amendment 2 (Simpson), failed; Roll Call 175: yeas 22, nays 28 | |
2011-02-21 | Amendment 4 (Tallian), failed; Roll Call 174: yeas 15, nays 35 | |
2011-02-21 | Amendment 5 (M. Young), prevailed; | |
2011-02-21 | Amendment 3 (Simpson), failed; Roll Call 173: yeas 15, nays 35 | |
2011-02-21 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-20 | Senator Boots added as first author | |
2011-01-20 | Senator Long removed as first author | |
2011-01-20 | Committee report: amended, reassigned to Committee on Pensions and Labor | |
2011-01-06 | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure | |
2011-01-06 | Authored by Senator Long |