IN SB0271 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate committee for the 2014 legislative interim the responsibility: (1) to receive testimony about a number of subjects related to water resources, including certain recommendations of the utility regulatory commission, the effect of water resource availability on state and regional economic development decisions, coordination of state government activities relating to water resources, and key elements that a state water plan should contain; and (2) to study the potential creation of a water institute and a water management authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water related study committee responsibilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Natural Resources - Roll Call 027102 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environmental Affairs - Roll Call 027101 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-03-27SenatePublic Law 197
2014-03-10SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-10SenateSigned by the Speaker
2014-02-27HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2014-02-27HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 339: yeas 92 and nays 0
2014-02-26HouseSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-24HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-10HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Natural Resources
2014-02-03SenateRepresentative Wolkins added as cosponsor.
2014-02-03SenateRepresentative Stemler added as cosponsor.
2014-02-03SenateRepresentative Koch added sponsor.
2014-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2014-02-03SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 110: yeas 48 and nays 0
2014-02-03SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor.
2014-01-30SenateSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-28SenateSenator Merritt added as coauthor.
2014-01-27SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor.
2014-01-27SenateSenator Leising added as third author.
2014-01-27SenateSenator Glick added as second author.
2014-01-27SenateCommittee report: do pass amend, adopted.
2014-01-13SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs
2014-01-13SenateAuthored by Senator Charbonneau.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/271/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/d/e/cedec618/SB0271.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/0/0/9a00fc9b/SB0271.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/b/7/dab77e61/SB0271.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/4/0/2a40b8b2/SB0271.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/4/8/f7488c11/SB0271.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/e/2/b3e2ef73/SB0271.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/3/a/d93a4ef6/SB0271.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/8/f/da8fbfcc/SB0271.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/0/8/390826b7/SB0271.02.COMS.110.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/6/6/01662831/SB0271.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/4/5/1245c11f/SB0271.03.COMH.339.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback