IN SB0263 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 187
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 187
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Faith-based and community initiatives foundation.
Title
Faith-based and community initiatives foundation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 187 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 473: yeas 42, nays 7 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Motion to concur in House amendments filed |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-03-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 292: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2013-03-18 | House | Representative Hale added as cosponsor |
2013-03-14 | House | Representative Macer added as cosponsor |
2013-03-14 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2013-02-05 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Frizzell |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 75: yeas 43 and nays 6 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senator Head added as second author |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as third author |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Merritt |