IN SB0262 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a pharmacist to substitute an interchangeable biosimilar product for a prescribed biological product if certain conditions are met. Requires a pharmacist to record in a certain manner the name and manufacturer of a biologic product that the pharmacist is dispensing not later than ten days after dispensing the biologic product. Requires the board of pharmacy to maintain a link on the board's website to the current list of all biological products that are determined by the United States Food and Drug Administration to be interchangeable with a specific reference biological product. Allows the board of pharmacy to adopt rules. Provides that a written or electronic prescription for a biological product must comply with the existing prescription form requirements. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the health finance commission.)
Title
Biosimilar drugs.
Sponsors
Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Rep. Mara Reardon [D] |
Rep. Steven Davisson [R] | Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Roll Call 026202 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 026201 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Roll Call 026202 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 026201 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Public Law 96 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-02-25 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2014-02-25 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 279: yeas 92 and nays 5 |
2014-02-24 | House | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-24 | House | SB 262 Amendment #1 (Austin) motion withdrawn. |
2014-02-24 | House | SB 262 Amendment #2 (Austin) motion withdrawn. |
2014-02-20 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-11 | House | Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Public Health |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative Candelaria Reardon added as cosponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative Davisson added as cosponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative Clere added as sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 76: yeas 38 and nays 11 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | SB 262 Amendment #1 (Boots), failed. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as second author. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hershman. |