IN SB0253 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies the ballot language for the submission of the proposed amendment to the Constitution of the State of Indiana concerning circuit breakers and other property tax matters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment ballot language.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-08 First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2010-02-02 Senators R. Young and Hume added as coauthors
2010-02-02 Cosponsor: Rep. Espich
2010-02-02 House sponsor: Rep. Crawford
2010-02-02 Referred to the House
2010-02-02 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 130: Yeas 36 and Nays 14
2010-02-01 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-02-01 Senator Kruse added as second author
2010-01-28 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-11 First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2010-01-11 Authored by Senator Kenley

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback