IN SB0248 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Makes changes to the powers of the state armory board to accept and convey real and personal property and to expend funds. Provides for certain changes to the structure of the state armory board, and expands the definition of "commanding officer". Provides that for purposes of the federal controlled substance statutes, the Indiana National Guard is considered a law enforcement agency and is eligible to receive forfeited property from federal law enforcement agencies. Establishes a First Sergeant Ribbon as an award for the Indiana Air National Guard.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indiana National Guard.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 38
2011-04-20 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-15 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-13 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-12 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-08 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2011-04-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 434: yeas 88, nays 0
2011-04-07 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-05 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2011-02-14 Senator Buck added as third author
2011-02-14 Cosponsor: Rep. GiaQuinta
2011-02-14 House sponsor: Rep. Borders
2011-02-14 Referred to the House
2011-02-14 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 116: yeas 47 and nays 3
2011-02-10 Senator Arnold added as second author
2011-02-10 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-02-08 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-01-18 Senator Wyss added as first author
2011-01-18 Senator Long removed as first author
2011-01-18 Committee report: amended, reassigned to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs
2011-01-06 First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2011-01-06 Authored by Senator Long

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback