IN SB0239 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Senate advisors appointed: Randolph, Walker and Buck
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Senate advisors appointed: Randolph, Walker and Buck
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits an administrative rule requiring a minimum assessment valuation (floor) for agricultural personal property. Changes the circuit breaker credit for agricultural property from 3% to 2% of assessed value. Requires trending adjustments to real property assessments every two years instead of annually. Requires assessors to document changes in assessment methodology. Includes certain residential yard structures (other than a swimming pools) in the definition of "homestead". Provides a deduction for personal proeprty in a certified technology park. Provides that Masonic lodges and Scottish Rite Valleys are exempt from property taxation. Replaces the requirement that school corporations budget on a school year basis with a provision permitting a school corporation to elect whether to budget on a calendar year or school year basis. Requires resolutions proposing a school tax referendum to be certified to the department of local government finance and the county fiscal body. Requires a county election board to submit the proposed language to be placed on the ballot in a controlled project referendum to the department of local government finance for review and approval. Requires a political subdivision to give notice to the circuit court clerk of the applicability of the petition and remonstrance process or the referendum process. Specifies deadlines for certification of the question for a referendum tax levy. Provides that, upon request by a county assessor, an employee of the Indiana board of tax review may assist taxpayers and local officials to voluntarily resolve property tax disputes. Exempts sales to a municipal golf course from sales taxes. Permits businesses with less than 35 employees to receive an economic development for a growing economy tax credit. Specifies that local option public safety income taxes may not be used to reduce or replace the amount expended for public safety from other sources. Exempts certain final disposal solid waste disposal facilities from the application of the state solid waste management plan law. Reduces from two to one the number of property owners that must be on the board of an economic improvement district when there is only one property owner in the district. Specifies that assessments in an economic improvement district are to be treated as special assessments. Requires district assessments for interest, maintenance, and repair charges to be separately stated. Permits money in a cumulative capital improvement fund of a city or town to be used for any governmental purpose.. Allows a city or town to reclassify a loan from one fund to another as a permanent transfer. Provides that annexations, governmental reorganizations, municipal mergers, town incorporations, municipal dissolutions, governmental name changes, or boundary alterations that would otherwise become effective under current law on January 2 of the year in which a federal decennial census is conducted shall instead become effective on January 1 of the year in which the federal decennial census is conducted. Amends a city budget statute to conform to deadlines changed in 2009. Permits certain third class cities to reduce the number of members on the legislative body from seven to four. Extends the time that may elapse between the date a notice for a public works bid is published and the date the bids must be received for certain local projects. Provides that notices for certain weed removal fees and sewage fees be sent by sent by certified mail, return receipt requested. Permits certain taxpayers to file a late property tax exemption application.
Title
State and local taxation and administration.
Sponsors
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. Lindel Hume [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Greg Walker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Senate advisors appointed: Randolph, Walker and Buck | |
2010-03-02 | Senate conferee appointed: Hershman and Skinner | |
2010-03-02 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 245: Yeas 99, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment 21 (Truitt), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment 9 (Leonard), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment 16 (Ruppel), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment 3 (Barnes), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment 10 (Richardson), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment 18 (Hinkle), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment 4 (DeLaney), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment 2 (Bardon), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment 7 (Tyler), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment 8 (Turner), failed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment 1 (Candelaria Reardon), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment 5 (Sullivan), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-24 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-22 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-11 | Representative Clements added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-02-02 | Senator Hume added as coauthor | |
2010-02-02 | Cosponsor: Rep. Espich | |
2010-02-02 | House sponsor: Rep. Welch | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 124: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Walker added as second author | |
2010-02-01 | Amendment 3 (Taylor), failed; Roll Call 83: Yeas 17, Nays 32 | |
2010-02-01 | Amendment 5 (M. Young), prevailed; Division of the Senate: Yeas 34, Nays 14 | |
2010-02-01 | Amendment 6 (Hershman), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-20 | Senators Buck and Randolph added as coauthors | |
2010-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | |
2010-01-11 | Authored by Senator Hershman |