IN SB0236 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Referred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Referred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Land banks. Provides that a county fiscal body may adopt an ordinance requiring that, for the five years after a tract is purchased from a land bank, 50% of the amount of property taxes paid on the tract must be transferred to the land bank. Requires a county executive to provide a land bank in the county with a list of tracts located in the territory of the land bank that: (1) are delinquent on property taxes; and (2) have been offered for public sale at least two times and remain unsold; on an annual basis, and permits the county executive to transfer its interest in a tract on the list to a land bank if requested by the land bank not later than 30 days after it receives the list.
Title
Land banks.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] |
Rep. Sue Errington [D] | Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Justin Moed [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Zent, Clere, Moed |
2021-02-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Errington |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 183: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second author |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senators Tomes and Niemeyer added as coauthors |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Lanane |