IN SB0230 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-14 - Senator Glick removed as coauthor
Pending: Senate Rules and Legislative Procedure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-14 - Senator Glick removed as coauthor
Pending: Senate Rules and Legislative Procedure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Applicability of federal law in Indiana.
Title
Applicability of federal law in Indiana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senator Glick removed as coauthor |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senator Nugent added as coauthor |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senators Eckerty and Glick added as coauthors |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senators Schneider and Landske added as coauthors |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senators Steele, Waterman and Kruse added as coauthors |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senator Banks added as coauthor |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Senator Delph added as third author |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second author |
2013-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2013&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0230 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/IN/IN0230.1.html |