IN SB0228 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that for a member of the public employees' retirement fund (PERF) who dies after June 30, 2013, the right to receive a death benefit from PERF vests with the designated beneficiary on file with PERF at the time of the member's death, as is the case under current law with the teachers' retirement fund (TRF). Provides that the board of the Indiana public retirement system (INPRS) shall elect officers by December 31 each year, rather than June 30 as specified in current law. Requires that an order for restitution be issued by the sentencing court before money may be taken from a PERF member's account to compensate an employer for a criminal taking by the member, and provides that money may be taken from a TRF member's account in the same manner as with PERF. Urges the legislative council to assign to the pension management oversight commission the task of studying the guaranteed fund, an investment option in the annuity savings account of PERF and TRF. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the pension management oversight commission.)
Title
Indiana public retirement system administrative matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 15 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-03-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-03-12 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2013-03-12 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 259: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2013-03-11 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-07 | House | Representative Niezgodski added as cosponsor |
2013-03-05 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second author |
2013-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Burton |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 21: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |