IN SB0226 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
Pending: House Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
Pending: House Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Equine dentistry. Provides that an individual who performs teeth floating on horses is exempt from the licensing or special permit requirements of the veterinary medicine laws if the individual has a valid certification from the International Association of Equine Dentistry or an equivalent certification approved by the board of veterinary medicine and acts under the direct supervision of a licensed veterinarian when administering a sedative drug to a horse before performing teeth floating on the horse. Specifies that an individual who performs teeth floating may not administer a sedative drug to a horse before performing teeth floating on the horse unless the individual administers the sedative drug to the horse under the direct supervision of a licensed veterinarian.
Title
Equine dentistry.
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Rep. Beau Baird [R] |
Rep. Donald Lehe [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Lehe |
2020-01-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Baird |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 30: yeas 40, nays 10 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as second author |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |