IN SB0205 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Public Law 96
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Public Law 96
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher training. Requires the department of education (department) to provide an initial practitioner license to an individual that competes an alternative teacher certification program. Requires the individual to complete a one year clinical experience program. Provides that the individual may not teach a special education course or be a teacher of record for a special education student. Provides that a school corporation, charter school, or state accredited nonpublic school shall submit a plan to the department if the school corporation, charter school, or state accredited nonpublic school hires one or more individuals who have received an initial practitioner license. Requires a teacher preparation program to include curriculum that instructs teachers about social emotional learning practices that are helpful in supporting students who have experienced trauma. Mandates that a teacher preparation program consider training teachers on evidence based social emotional learning practices that are consistent with the state's social emotional learning competencies established by the department of education. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Teacher training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 63 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 63 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Public Law 96 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 445: yeas 28, nays 14 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2021-04-14 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2021-04-13 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 437: yeas 63, nays 26 |
2021-04-12 | House | Amendment #2 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-04-12 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senator Donato added as coauthor |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as coauthor |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Behning and Goodrich |
2021-02-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative DeVon |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 182: yeas 28, nays 20 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Rogers) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senator Buchanan added as second author |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as coauthor |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senator Walker K added as third author |
2021-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rogers |