IN SB0200 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Homeland Security & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Homeland Security & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Driving cards. Provides that an individual who is an Indiana resident and cannot provide proof of identity and lawful status in the United States may apply for a driving card learner's permit and driving card to obtain driving privileges. Provides that a driving card learner's permit and driving card may not be used for federal identification or any other federal purpose. Requires an individual who holds a driving card learner's permit or driving card and operates a motor vehicle to verify and continuously maintain financial responsibility on any motor vehicle the holder operates in the amount required by law. Provides that the bureau of motor vehicles may not disclose certain information unless presented with a lawful court order or judicial warrant. Makes conforming changes. Makes technical corrections.
Title
Driving cards.
Sponsors
Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] |
Sen. Shelli Yoder [D] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as coauthor |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as third author |
2022-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senators Niezgodski and Doriot |