IN SB0197 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 217
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Copies of identifying adoption information. Provides that a person releasing identifying adoption information must, upon request by the individual requesting the identifying information, provide copies of the identifying information to the individual. Makes a correction regarding exceptions to the release of identifying information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Copies of identifying adoption information. Provides that a person releasing identifying adoption information must, upon request by the individual requesting the identifying information, provide copies of the identifying information to the individual. Makes a correction regarding exceptions to the release of identifying information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05SenatePublic Law 217
2019-05-05SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-23HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 608: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-04-23SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 568: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-23HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-23SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-16HouseHouse advisors appointed: Young J, Engleman, DeLaney and Hatfield
2019-04-16HouseHouse conferees appointed: Steuerwald and Bauer
2019-04-15SenateSenate advisors appointed: Merritt, Lanane and Buck
2019-04-15SenateSenate conferees appointed: Head and Randolph Lonnie M
2019-04-15SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2019-04-15SenateMotion to dissent filed
2019-03-19HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-03-18HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 316: yeas 93, nays 0
2019-03-14HouseAmendment #1 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote
2019-03-14HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-25SenateReferred to the House
2019-01-24SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Steuerwald
2019-01-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 30: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-01-22SenateSenator Buck added as third author
2019-01-15SenateSenator Merritt added as second author
2019-01-14SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-01-14SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-10SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Head

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/197/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/b/e/cebeea46/SB0197.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/5/1/4f513eb8/SB0197.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/d/9/f0d9edac/SB0197.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/9/8/eb98a208/SB0197.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/d/d/0ddd7028/SB0197.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/d/4/a1d4a3bc/SB0197.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/7/e/987e78d7/SB0197.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/5/6/fb56099f/SB0197.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/4/1/6941472d/SB0197.01.INTR.06.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/7/d/567db839/SB0197.30.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/e/b/d3eb39cb/SB0197.02.COMS.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/7/9/a2796e17/SB0197.316.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/c/0/cec0b77d/SB0197.568.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/8/b/798bca6c/SB0197.608.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback