IN SB0197 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Internet crimes investigation fund and fee. Establishes the Internet crimes investigation fund (fund). Requires the state police department (department) to administer the fund and use money in the fund to: (1) pay for costs incurred by the department for training, purchasing equipment, and investigating felonies and misdemeanors that involve the use of the Internet, including crimes against children that involve use of the Internet; and (2) award grants to county, city, and town law enforcement agencies that agree to use the money to investigate Internet crimes against children in accordance with United States Department of Justice Internet Crimes Against Children

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Internet crimes investigation fund and fee. Establishes the Internet crimes investigation fund (fund). Requires the state police department (department) to administer the fund and use money in the fund to: (1) pay for costs incurred by the department for training, purchasing equipment, and investigating felonies and misdemeanors that involve the use of the Internet, including crimes against children that involve use of the Internet; and (2) award grants to county, city, and town law enforcement agencies that agree to use the money to investigate Internet crimes against children in accordance with United States Department of Justice Internet Crimes Against Children

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2016-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2016-02-02SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Koch
2016-02-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 135: yeas 46, nays 4
2016-02-01SenateSenator Merritt added as coauthor
2016-02-01SenateSenator Head added as second author
2016-02-01SenateSenator Head removed as coauthor
2016-02-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-26SenateSenator Hershman added as coauthor
2016-01-25SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2016-01-21SenateSenators Head and Steele added as coauthors
2016-01-21SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2016-01-12SenateSenator Arnold added as coauthor
2016-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Crider

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback