IN SB0191 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-26 - Senator Delph added as third author
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-26 - Senator Delph added as third author
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a waiver or release of the right of remonstrance against annexation effective after June 30, 2010, expires ten years after the date the waiver or release is executed.
Title
Annexation remonstrance waivers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-26 | Senator Delph added as third author | |
2010-01-11 | Senator Gard added as second author | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Senator Buck |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2010&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0191 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2010/IN/IN0191.1.html |