IN SB0190 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Controlled projects. Amends the definition of a "controlled project" to exclude projects exclusively for engineering, land and right-of-way acquisition, construction, resurfacing, maintenance, restoration, and rehabilitation of: (1) local road and street systems; (2) arterial road and street systems; and (3) any combination of local and arterial road and street systems; including bridges that are designated as being in a road and street system. Provides that the restrictions on supporting a position on a controlled project apply to any political subdivision that has assessed value within the same taxing district as the political subdivision proposing the project. Provides that nothing shall prevent another political subdivision that has assessed value within the same taxing district as the political subdivision from adopting a resolution or taking a position on a local public question.
Title
Controlled projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 60 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 343: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 357: yeas 29, nays 19 |
2020-03-09 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Houchin and Ford J.D. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Holdman and Taylor G |
2020-03-04 | House | House advisors appointed: Goodrich, Karickhoff, Hamilton and Wright |
2020-03-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Thompson and Pryor |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 276: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Amendment #1 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-03-02 | House | Amendment #2 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-03-02 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Thompson |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 73: yeas 39, nays 11 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as second author |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |