IN SB0178 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a paternity affidavit to contain: (1) a provision that allows the mother and the man identified as the father to agree to share joint legal custody of the child; (2) a statement explaining joint legal custody; (3) a provision stating that if the parties do not agree to share joint legal custody, the mother has sole legal custody; (4) a provision stating that even if the parties agree to share joint legal custody, the mother has primary physical custody; (5) a provision stating that an agreement to share joint legal custody is void unless the result of a genetic test performed by an accredited laboratory: (A) indicates that the man identified as the child's biological father is the child's biological father; and (B) is submitted to a local health officer not later than 60 days after the child's birth; and (6) a statement with signature lines that affirms that the child's mother or the person identified as the child's father, if less than 18 years of age, has had an opportunity to consult with an adult chosen by that individual. Provides that the man who is identified as the father has parenting time in accordance with the parenting time guidelines. Provides that, if a paternity affidavit is executed, the mother has primary physical custody of the child. Requires that an action to establish custody or parenting time brought by a party who has agreed in a paternity affidavit to share joint legal custody be tried de novo. Requires that a paternity affidavit be presented separately to the child's mother and the man who reasonably appears to be the child's biological father before it is signed. Provides that an agreement in the paternity affidavit to share joint legal custody is void if: (1) a genetic test performed by an accredited laboratory indicates that the man identified as the child's biological father is not the biological father of the child; or (2) the man fails to submit the genetic test results to a local health officer not later than 60 days after the date of the child's birth. Provides that an individual who: (1) is the child's mother or a man identified as the child's biological father; and (2) is less than 18 years of age; must be given the opportunity to consult with an adult chosen by the individual regarding the contents of the paternity affidavit before signing the affidavit.
Title
Custody and parenting time matters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 25 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-04 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 291: Yeas 90, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended | |
2010-03-04 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 263: Yeas 48, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-03 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2010-03-01 | House advisors appointed: Riecken, Stilwell, Bell and Yarde | |
2010-03-01 | House conferees appointed: VanDenburgh and Noe | |
2010-03-01 | Senate advisors appointed: Mishler, Head and Taylor | |
2010-03-01 | Senate conferees appointed: Steele and Lanane | |
2010-03-01 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 242: Yeas 95, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-23 | Amendment 1 (Riecken), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-23 | Amendment 4 (VanDenburgh), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-23 | Amendment 3 (VanDenburgh), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-23 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-22 | Representative Noe added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-18 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-11 | Representative Yarde added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs | |
2010-02-02 | Senator Lanane added as coauthor | |
2010-02-02 | Cosponsor: Rep. Koch | |
2010-02-02 | House sponsor: Rep. VanDenburgh | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 111: Yeas 49 and Nays 1 | |
2010-02-01 | Amendment 2 (M. Young), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-01 | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-26 | Senator Taylor added as coauthor | |
2010-01-21 | Senator Mishler added as second author | |
2010-01-21 | Placed back on second reading | |
2010-01-19 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-14 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Senator Steele |