IN SB0173 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes requirements for membership on a board of aviation commissioners or an airport authority board. Provides that after a board of aviation commissioners or an airport authority board enters into a loan contract, the board may use funds received from state or federal grants to satisfy the repayment of part or all of the loan contract.
Title
Airport boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-06 | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 312: yeas 48, nays 0 | |
2012-03-01 | Motion to concur in House amendments filed | |
2012-02-28 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2012-02-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 264: yeas 91, nays 4 | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment 1 (Dermody), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-27 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation | |
2012-01-31 | House sponsor: Rep. Soliday | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 117: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-30 | Senator Breaux added as coauthor | |
2012-01-30 | Senator M. Young added as second author | |
2012-01-30 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Lawson |