IN SB0156 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a redevelopment commission may, subject to prior approval by the unit's fiscal body, provide financial assistance to the owner of commercial property within a redevelopment project area or economic development area designated by the redevelopment commission to assist the owner in constructing, rehabilitating, or repairing the commercial property. Provides that the additional authority for a redevelopment commission to provide such financial assistance expires July 1, 2019. Specifies that the fiscal body of the unit that established the redevelopment commission must separately approve each grant, loan, or other expenditure for such financial assistance. Provides that the terms of any loan made under the provisions in the bill may be changed only if the change is approved by the fiscal body of the unit that established the redevelopment commission. Specifies that these provisions do not apply to Clark County or to a redevelopment commission in Clark County. Specifies the procedure for fiscal body approval under these provisions in the case of a redevelopment commission that was jointly established by more than one unit.
Title
Redevelopment commissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 015601 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 015601 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Wolkins added sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 103: yeas 44 and nays 4 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | SB 156 Amendment #1 (Head), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | SB 156 Amendment #4 (Head), prevailed. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Broden removed as second author. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second author. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee report; amend do pass; adopted |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Broden added as second author. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Head |