IN SB0156 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Representative Austin added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Representative Austin added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Downloading of cell phone information by police.
Title
Downloading of cell phone information by police.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Brent Waltz [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] |
Sen. Lindel Hume [D] | Sen. John Waterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Representative Austin added as cosponsor |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senator Waterman added as coauthor |
2013-02-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Speedy |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 168: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senators Randolph, Delph and Hume added as coauthors |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senator M. Young added as second author |
2013-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Waltz |