IN SB0148 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Zoning and housing matters. Amends a statute concerning manufactured homes (manufactured home statute) to provide, with respect to a manufactured home located outside of a mobile home community, as follows: (1) A comprehensive plan or zoning ordinance adopted by a unit of local government may: (A) specify aesthetic standards and requirements concerning the manufactured home's permanent foundation system; and (B) require compatibility of the manufactured home's permanent foundation system with surrounding residential structures. (2) A unit of local government may not require: (A) a permanent foundation system that is incompatible with the structural design of the manufactured home; or (B) more than one permanent foundation system for a manufactured home. Specifies that the changes to the manufactured home statute do not affect a requirement applicable to property that is subject to the jurisdiction of a preservation commission. Provides that a unit of local government may not adopt or enforce certain ordinances, regulations, requirements, or other restrictions that mandate size requirements for a manufactured home that is placed in a mobile home community. Provides that, subject to certain conditions, an industrialized residential structure may be located in a mobile home community. Requires a mobile home community operator (operator) to provide all owners of mobile homes, manufactured homes, or industrialized residential structures in a mobile home community with written notice not less than 180 days before the mobile home community's closure. Provides that an operator who violates the notice requirement commits a deceptive act that is actionable by the attorney general or a consumer. Prohibits a unit of local government from regulating certain aspects of a landlord-tenant relationship with respect to privately owned real property located in the unit unless the regulation is authorized by the general assembly. Prohibits a landlord from taking certain retaliatory actions in response to a tenant's engaging in one or more enumerated protected activities. Prohibits a local unit from adopting or enforcing any ordinance or regulation concerning retaliatory acts by landlords. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Zoning and housing matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25SenateVetoed by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-11HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 379: yeas 64, nays 32
2020-03-11SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 374: yeas 29, nays 19
2020-03-11HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-10SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-10HouseRepresentative Manning added as conferee
2020-03-10HouseRepresentative Shackleford removed as conferee
2020-03-10SenateSenator Young M added as conferee
2020-03-10SenateSenator Lanane removed as conferee
2020-03-10HouseRepresentative Moed removed as cosponsor
2020-03-10SenateSenator Young M added as coauthor
2020-03-05SenateSenator Freeman added as advisor
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Rogers, Taylor G and Zay
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Doriot and Lanane
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Torr, Zent and Porter
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Miller D and Shackleford
2020-03-04SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2020-03-04SenateMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2020-03-03HouseRepresentative Moed added as cosponsor
2020-03-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 273: yeas 92, nays 3
2020-03-02HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-27HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2020-02-04SenateReferred to the House
2020-02-03SenateCosponsors: Representatives Pressel and Stutzman
2020-02-03SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Miller D
2020-02-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 113: yeas 32, nays 15
2020-01-30SenateAmendment #1 (Doriot) prevailed; voice vote
2020-01-30SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-30SenateSenator Rogers added as second author
2020-01-27SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2020-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Doriot

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/148/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/7/d/8d7d4b7f/SB0148.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/e/7/a2e78dc4/SB0148.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/7/8/9178946f/SB0148.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/c/0/acc0cb96/SB0148.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/7/4/f174656a/SB0148.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/b/7/6cb707fe/SB0148.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/8/b/3e8b779e/SB0148.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/b/1/34b1551f/SB0148.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/7/6/f97655f2/SB0148.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/2/e/ca2eb8a5/SB0148.113_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/b/d/a9bd3575/SB0148.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/8/e/f48eca48/SB0148.273_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/2/1/95213d11/SB0148.379_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/7/3/0f732210/SB0148.374_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback