IN SB0129 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Senator Randolph added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Family & Children Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Senator Randolph added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Family & Children Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eligibility for child care voucher. Provides that a child who is otherwise eligible for participation in the federal Child Care and Development Fund voucher program: (1) is eligible to participate in the program if the child's family income does not exceed 200% of the federal income poverty level; and (2) may continue to participate unless the child's family income exceeds 250% of the federal income poverty level. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Eligibility for child care voucher. Provides that a child who is otherwise eligible for participation in the federal Child Care and Development Fund voucher program: (1) is eligible to participate in the program if the child's family income does not exceed 200% of the federal income poverty level; and (2) may continue to participate unless the child's family income exceeds 250% of the federal income poverty level. Makes an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as second author |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Family & Children Services |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Broden |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/129/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/7/8/7978106e/SB0129.01.INTR.pdf |