IN SB0119 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Public Law 91
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Public Law 91
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
1977 fund purchase of service. Allows a member of the 1977 police officers' and firefighters' pension and disability fund (1977 fund) to purchase service performed in Indiana as a full-time, fully paid police officer or firefighter for an employer that does not participate in the 1977 fund.
Title
1977 fund purchase of service. Allows a member of the 1977 police officers' and firefighters' pension and disability fund (1977 fund) to purchase service performed in Indiana as a full-time, fully paid police officer or firefighter for an employer that does not participate in the 1977 fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Eddie Melton [D] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Steven Stemler [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public Law 91 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-06 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2018-03-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 302: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2018-03-01 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as third author |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Senator Ford added as second author |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Stemler |
2018-01-09 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Clere |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 8: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Grooms |