IN SB0118 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows alcoholic beverages to be sold on election days.
Title
Election day sales.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2010-02-02 | Senator Arnold added as coauthor | |
2010-02-02 | Cosponsor: Rep. Bell | |
2010-02-02 | House sponsor: Rep. VanHaaften | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 99: Yeas 30 and Nays 20 | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Merritt added as second author | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Public Policy & Interstate Cooperation | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Senator Alting |