IN SB0098 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Public Law 47
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Public Law 47
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Interstate compact transportation fund. Allows a community corrections agency to access funds from the county offender transportation fund to defray the cost of transporting offenders and delinquent children as requested by a court, a probation department, a community corrections agency, or a county sheriff.
Title
Interstate compact transportation fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Public Law 47 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-03-31 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2021-03-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 328: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2021-03-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senator Baldwin S added as second author |
2021-01-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Davis |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 11: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sandlin |