IN SB0090 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Marion County auto rental and admissions taxes.
Title
Marion County auto rental and admissions taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Brent Waltz [R] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] |
Sen. Patricia Miller [R] | Sen. Scott Schneider [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Cosponsor: Rep. Thompson |
2013-02-12 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Turner |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 103: yeas 37 and nays 12 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senators Delph, Crider, Pat Miller and Schneider added as coauthors |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senator Waltz added as second author |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Senator M. Young added as first author |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Senator Long removed as first author |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Committee report: amended, reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2013-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Long |